California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2128 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill May 17, 2018
Bill April 26, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018
Bill March 22, 2018