|
09/21/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6892.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5885.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5468.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|