|
07/24/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 134, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2495.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1841.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1373.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1300.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|