California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2151 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2018

Amended

Bill June 14, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018
Bill March 13, 2018