California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2155 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2018

Amended

Bill August 15, 2018
Bill June 13, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018
Bill April 5, 2018
Bill March 20, 2018