Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 5619.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2018
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|