|
09/28/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5607.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4646.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|