|
09/10/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 316, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5285.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5587.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5363.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|