07/09/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2018. | |||
07/09/2018 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 06/29/2018 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.). | ||
Senate | 06/14/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2018 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4529.) | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 20). | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2018 | Read first time. To print. |