|
09/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 863, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 2.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5589.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 5373.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|