|
09/27/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 311, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2914.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2329.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 840.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|