California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2184 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 28, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018
Bill April 9, 2018