Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5589.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2018
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|