California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018