Assembly | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2018 | Read first time. To print. |