|
09/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 432, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 6. Page 5510.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 5622.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|