California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018
Bill March 14, 2018