Senate | 06/14/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2018 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5624.) | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 21). | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2018 | Read first time. To print. |