California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill May 10, 2018
Bill May 1, 2018