Assembly | 05/23/2018 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2018 | Read first time. To print. |