Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2018 | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2018 | Read first time. To print. |