|
06/13/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 27, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5367.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4220.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4530.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|