Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2018 | Read first time. To print. |