Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2017 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2017 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 13). | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2017 | Read first time. To print. |