|
10/03/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 436, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3278.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2695.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1142.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|