|
09/07/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5519.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5427.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|