Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4823.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|