|
09/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 5336.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 4. Page 5203.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5094.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|