Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2018 | Read first time. To print. |