Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5414.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|