|
09/27/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5281.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5415.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|