|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 943, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6621.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5513.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4783.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|