|
08/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6140.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5107.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5250.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|