|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 7039.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6729.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5635.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Anderson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5133.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|