Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 5646.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|