|
09/07/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 6371.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 5289.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 9. Page 4824.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|