Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4638.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|