|
09/21/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6786.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5821.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5437.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|