|
09/22/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 704, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 6140.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 5603.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 5603.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1388.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|