|
09/29/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6869.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5823.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5418.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|