Senate | 08/16/2018 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/05/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2018 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). | ||
Senate | 06/07/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5301.) | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2018 | Read first time. To print. |