Assembly | 04/23/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2018 | Read first time. To print. |