California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 15, 2018
Bill June 4, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018
Bill April 19, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018