Senate
|
02/26/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1614.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|