California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2381 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2018

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018