LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB239
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB239
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB239
Action History
Assembly
02/01/2018
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
01/31/2018
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
Assembly
04/24/2017
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Assembly
02/06/2017
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Assembly
01/31/2017
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
Assembly
01/30/2017
Read first time. To print.