Senate | 06/07/2018 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5305.) | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2018 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2018 | Read first time. To print. |