|
09/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 434, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6656.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5653.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5369.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5299.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|