|
07/09/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5927.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4664.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4789.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|