California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 8, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2018

Amended

Bill April 18, 2018
Bill March 22, 2018